Reddy v. Buttar
Petitioner: Rachan Damidi Reddy
Respondent: Rashid A. Buttar
Case Number: 3:2018cv00172
Filed: April 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside of U.S.
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER administratively denying as moot 23 Motion for Sanctions and/or to Compel [Discovery]; denying 25 Amended Motion for Sanctions and/or to Compel [Discover]. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/20/19. (tob)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/14/19. (clc)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay. Respondent may file an Amended Memorandum and Support of his Motion to Dismiss on or before 1/18/19. Petitioner shall file Amended Memorandum in Opposition on or before 2/1/19. Respondent's Amended Reply shall be due on 2/8/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/19. (tob)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying in part and deferring ruling in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 15 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 16 Motion to Continue discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/16/18. (clc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy v. Buttar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rachan Damidi Reddy
Represented By: Joel M. Bondurant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rashid A. Buttar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?