Gean v. Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Thomasina Cofield Gean
Defendant: Classroom Teachers Association, Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools and EEOC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00437
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of intent not to file reply by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools. (Wallace, Terry)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry L. Wallace on behalf of Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools (Wallace, Terry)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 10/4/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/20/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Classroom Teachers Association. (Ledford, Joseph)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Classroom Teachers Association. Responses due by 10/4/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Ledford, Joseph). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Ledford on behalf of Classroom Teachers Association (Ledford, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 PROS SE RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomasina Cofield Gean. Replies due by 9/25/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mga) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (mga).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/14/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/4/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) Modified text on 9/4/2018 (mga).
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education. Responses due by 9/14/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Rogers, Courtney). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Classroom Teachers Association, EEOC, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools. (ams)
August 13, 2018 Filing Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD049698 (brj)
August 8, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail. (ams)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education, Classroom Teachers Association, Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools, EEOC, filed by Thomasina Cofield Gean. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachments, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(ams) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gean v. Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomasina Cofield Gean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classroom Teachers Association
Represented By: Joseph L. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Mecklenburg Board of Education
Represented By: Courtney Collins Rogers
Represented By: Terry L. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntingtowne Farms Elementary Schools
Represented By: Terry L. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?