Carotrans International, Inc. v. Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carotrans International, Inc.
Defendant: David Carl Brinkley, Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC, David Allen Scott, David Neal Ruff and Benjamin Neal Cooper
Case Number: 3:2018cv00448
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside District
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carotrans International, Inc.. David Allen Scott served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Buskirk, Seth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carotrans International, Inc.. Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Buskirk, Seth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carotrans International, Inc.. David Neal Ruff served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Buskirk, Seth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carotrans International, Inc.. David Carl Brinkley served on 9/6/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Buskirk, Seth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carotrans International, Inc.. Benjamin Neal Cooper served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Buskirk, Seth)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. David Carl Brinkley answer due 10/15/2018; Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC answer due 10/15/2018; Benjamin Neal Cooper answer due 10/15/2018; David Neal Ruff answer due 10/15/2018; David Allen Scott answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/28/18. (tob)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Hayes Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Nicholas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC (Adams, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,,,,, by David Carl Brinkley, Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC, Benjamin Neal Cooper, David Neal Ruff, David Allen Scott. (Adams, Michael). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carotrans International, Inc. (Buskirk, Seth)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Brinkley, #2 Summons - Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC, #3 Summons - Ruff, #4 Summons - Scott)(brl)
August 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Peter Buskirk on behalf of Carotrans International, Inc. (Buskirk, Seth)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3778976), filed by Carotrans International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Rate Proposal and Booking Confirmation - FCLNIN1648002, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Terms and Conditions -, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - emails regarding number of containers and weights - FCLNIN1648002, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - VGM provided - FCLNIN1648002, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Bill of Lading - FCLNIN1648002, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Booking Confirmation - FCLNIN1705001, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - email exchange - FCLNIN1705001, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - VGM provided - FCLNIN1705001 -, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Bill of Lading - FCLNIN1705001, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Bookling Confirmation - FCLNIN1707002 -, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - VGM provided - FCLNIN1707002 -, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Bill of Lading - FCLNIN1707002, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Booking Confirmation - FCLNIN1706003, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - VGM - FCLNIN1706003 -, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - BOL - FCLNIN1706003, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Booking confirmation - FCLHPH1709002, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - new booking confirmation - FCLHPH1709002, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - third booking confirmation - FCLHPH1709002, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - VGM- FCLHPH1709002 -, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - BOL - FCLHPH1709002, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - 2018-08-15_StatementOfAccount)(Buskirk, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carotrans International, Inc. v. Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carl Brinkley
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Recycle Partners, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allen Scott
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neal Ruff
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Neal Cooper
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carotrans International, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Peter Buskirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?