Castillo v. Beacon Hill Apartments
Plaintiff: Jose E. Rodriguez Castillo
Defendant: Beacon Hill Apartments
Case Number: 3:2018cv00456
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 PSAP Opt In/Out Form mailed to Pro Se Litigant. Response due by 10/2/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (brl)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Beacon Hill Apartments.(Honeycutt, James)
August 20, 2018 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon Hill Apartments (Honeycutt, James)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-14286. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3782978), filed by Beacon Hill Apartments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal from State Court, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Honeycutt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Beacon Hill Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose E. Rodriguez Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Hill Apartments
Represented By: James Michael Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?