United States of America v. Approximately $22,960.00 in funds

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $22,960.00 in funds
Case Number: 3:2018cv00523
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
0 Judge: Max O Cogburn
1 Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date October 28, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 11, 2018 5 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 9, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Bain-Creed on behalf of United States of America (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 1, 2018 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Moore, Tiffany)
September 27, 2018 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property (brl) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/28/2018) (tmg).
September 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
September 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Moore, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $22,960.00 in funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $22,960.00 in funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?