Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2018cv00538
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan answer due 12/7/2018; Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2018. (brl)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Gray Styron Symonds on behalf of Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Symonds, Hannah)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Symonds, Hannah). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Duke Energy)(brl)
October 5, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3829076), filed by Mark Smith.(Matesic, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Hannah Gray Styron Symonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Hannah Gray Styron Symonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Represented By: Rachel Christine Matesic
Represented By: Bryan Lee Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?