Worley Claims Services, LLC v. Jefferies et al
Plaintiff: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Defendant: Tim Simmons, Allcat Claims Services, LLC, Robert Wilkey, Tom Jefferies and James Barlow
Case Number: 3:2018cv00547
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Defendant Tim Simmons shall have up through and including Monday, December 31, 2018 to serve his Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/27/2018. (STB)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Tim Simmons. (Shook, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Earl Shook on behalf of Tim Simmons (Shook, Benjamin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC. Tim Simmons served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Tim Simmons)(Bryant, Lyndey)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allcat Claims Services, LLC (Kirk, Kimberly)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allcat Claims Services, LLC answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/9/2018. (ams)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Allcat Claims Services, LLC, Tom Jefferies, Robert Wilkey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kirk, Kimberly)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Jill Kirk on behalf of Allcat Claims Services, LLC, Tom Jefferies, Robert Wilkey (Kirk, Kimberly)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Worley Claims Services, LLC. Tom Jefferies waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; Robert Wilkey waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons for Defendants Jefferies and Wilkey)(Bryant, Lyndey)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC. Allcat Claims Services, LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Allcat Claims Service, LLC)(Bryant, Lyndey)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Barlow by Worley Claims Services, LLC (Bryant, Lyndey)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Allcat Claims Services, LLC, James Barlow, Tom Jefferies, Tim Simmons, Robert Wilkey. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5)(ams)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Worley Claims Services, LLC (Bryant, Lyndey)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3831193), filed by Worley Claims Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tom Jefferies Retention and Non-Compete, #2 Exhibit Robert Wilkey Retention and Noncompete, #3 Exhibit James Barlow Employee Handbook, #4 Exhibit Tim Simmons Employee Handbook, #5 Exhibit Letter to Tom Jefferies, #6 Exhibit Letter to Robert Wilkey, #7 Affidavit Verification)(Bryant, Lyndey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worley Claims Services, LLC v. Jefferies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Simmons
Represented By: Benjamin Earl Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allcat Claims Services, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkey
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Jefferies
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?