United States of America v. Ramirez

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Diane J Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2018cv00566
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Diane J. Ramirez by Diane J Ramirez (Culp, Heather)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by United States of America. United States of America served on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Julia) Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct answer due date as reflected by the order, NEF re-generated (thh).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Diane J Ramirez answer due 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2018. (brl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Diane J Ramirez. (Culp, Heather). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Diane J Ramirez. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
October 17, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diane J Ramirez, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wood, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane J Ramirez
Represented By: Heather W. Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julia Kay Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?