Franklin v. Esper

Plaintiff: Iona Franklin
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 3:2018cv00573
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mark T. Esper.(Sullivan, James)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting with modification #8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. The parties may redact portions of the sealed Administrative Record included in their briefs or motions, provided they also file an unredacted version under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/20/2018. (eef)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Administrative Record by United States of America; (available to Mark T. Esper, Iona Franklin) (Sullivan, James)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Seal. The Administrative Record may be filed under seal and shall remain SEALED until otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/19/18. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Mark T. Esper. Responses due by 1/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Sullivan, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Seal by Mark T. Esper. Responses due by 1/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Adminstrative Record Index)(Sullivan, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Iona Franklin. Mark T. Esper served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Atkins, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Iona Franklin. Mark T. Esper served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Atkins, Andrew)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. Document No. 1-2, pp. 6-124 and Document No. 1-3 shall be SEALED until otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/7/18. (mga)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Seal Exhibits to the Complaint by Iona Franklin. Responses due by 11/21/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Atkins, Andrew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark T. Esper. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ams)
October 23, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark T. Esper ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3843161), filed by Iona Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Atkins, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iona Franklin
Represented By: Andrew D. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?