Hatten v. Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathynel A. Hatten
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc. and OneBeacon Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00591
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/6/2018. (clc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC.(Smith, Allen)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ryan Walsh on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC (Walsh, Austin)
November 7, 2018 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Smith, Allen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneBeacon Services, LLC d/b/a OneBeacon Insurance Group (Smith, Allen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc. (Smith, Allen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-19232. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3856664), filed by Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC d/b/a OneBeacon Insurance Group, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Smith, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatten v. Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathynel A. Hatten
Represented By: Charles William Hinnant, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Represented By: Austin Ryan Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Represented By: Austin Ryan Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Services, LLC
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Represented By: Austin Ryan Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?