Langley et al v. Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gordon Langley, Paul Maull, IV and William A Powell
Defendant: Wayne Smith, Jr, Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC, Stephen E Smith, Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough, Wayne Smith, Jr. and Stephen E. Smith
Case Number: 3:2018cv00619
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/29/2019. (brl)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC (Wood, Stacy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stephen E. Smith, Wayne Smith, Jr, Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC, Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough.(Wood, Stacy)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including January 7, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/13/18. (mga)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Stephen E. Smith, Wayne Smith, Jr, Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC, Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Wood, Stacy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stephen E. Smith, Wayne Smith, Jr, Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC, Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4)(ams)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. McNeill Stokes hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs Gordon Langley and Paul Maull IV. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/16/18. (mga)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to McNeill Stokes Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3865224. by Gordon Langley, Paul Maull, IV, William A Powell. (Faucher, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen E Smith, Wayne Smith, Jr, Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC, Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3865132), filed by Gordon Langley, William A Powell, Paul Maull, IV. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Faucher, James)
November 16, 2018 Notice to McNeill Stokes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/23/2018. (mga)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to McNeill Stokes Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3865224. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langley et al v. Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Turf & Irrigation, LLC
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna-Lindsay Yarbrough
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E. Smith
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Langley
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Represented By: James Robert Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Maull, IV
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Represented By: James Robert Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Powell
Represented By: James Robert Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?