USA v. Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Approximately $252,140 in US Currency and Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Robert Shumake, International Human Rights Commission and Darren Coleman
Case Number: 3:2018cv00646
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by International Human Rights Commission.(Michael, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Shumake.(Michael, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Darren Coleman.(Michael, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by Darren Coleman. (Michael, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by International Human Rights Commission. (Michael, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by Robert Shumake. (Michael, David)
January 3, 2019 Notice to David M. Michael: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/10/2019. (tob)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David M. Michael for Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/3/19. (tob)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date January 2, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Michael Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3898789. by Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency. (Owen, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by USA. (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest In Rem (brl)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $252,140 in US Currency, filed by USA.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $252,140 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $252,140.00 in US Currency
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Shumake
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: International Human Rights Commission
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darren Coleman
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?