Johnson et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Brian S. Johnson and Trisha N. Johnson
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00653
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 4 days. Discovery due by 7/9/2019. Motions due by 8/6/2019. Mediation deadline set for 7/23/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/15/18. (clc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Pocock, Donald)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/28/2019. (jaw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Pocock, Donald)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC shall have up to and including December 27, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/14/18. (mga)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Extension of Time)(Pocock, Donald). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ams)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Pocock on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Pocock, Donald)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Farzad, Ramona)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 21466. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3882152), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farzad, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Represented By: Ramona Farzad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian S. Johnson
Represented By: Travis E. Collum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha N. Johnson
Represented By: Travis E. Collum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?