Cannon v. Charter Communications
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Cannon
Defendant: Charter Communications
Case Number: 3:2018cv00657
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Response to Order by Nathaniel Cannon re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jaw)
January 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: EEOC Notice of Charge due by 1/28/2019. (brl)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is ordered to file the EEOC Notice of Charge within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/14/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathaniel Cannon. (rth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, filed by Nathaniel Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Summons)(rth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?