Regions Bank v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: TD Private Client Wealth, LLC, David Blair Thompson and Jennifer Lynn Cute
Case Number: 3:2018cv00666
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Regions Bank. TD Private Client Wealth, LLC waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Roberts, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Regions Bank. Jennifer Lynn Cute waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Roberts, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Regions Bank. David Blair Thompson waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Roberts, Jason)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles H. Cope for Regions Bank. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/02/2019. (brl)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jason K. Roberts for Regions Bank. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/02/2019. (brl)
January 2, 2019 Notice to Jason K. Roberts: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/9/2019. (brl)
January 2, 2019 Notice to Charles H. Cope: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/9/2019. (brl)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank (VanHoy, Philip)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles H. Cope Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3891910. by Regions Bank. (VanHoy, Philip)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason K. Roberts Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3891903. by Regions Bank. (VanHoy, Philip)
December 14, 2018 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3887026), filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(VanHoy, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Philip M. VanHoy
Represented By: Charles Haley Cope
Represented By: Jason K. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Private Client Wealth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blair Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lynn Cute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?