Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. v. Armstrong World Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Armstrong World Industries, Inc. and Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00679
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Shook, Benjamin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (clc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Shook, Benjamin)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel B. Prieto terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/19. (tob)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Responses due by 2/15/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Shook, Benjamin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Earl Shook on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Shook, Benjamin)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference and the Court hereby withdraws the reference of the Bankruptcy Court of this Adversary Proceeding. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/18/2019. (brl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Morgan L. Patterson for Armstrong World Industries, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/09/2019. (brl)
January 9, 2019 Notice to Ericka F. Johnson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/16/2019. (brl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ericka F. Johnson for Armstrong World Industries, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/09/2019. (brl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew P. Ward for Armstrong World Industries, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/09/2019. (brl)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Morgan L. Patterson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3904681. by Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Towery, Christopher)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ericka F. Johnson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3904679. by Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Towery, Christopher)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew P. Ward Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3904677. by Armstrong World Industries, Inc.. (Towery, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Responses due by 1/11/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (bkAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. v. Armstrong World Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armstrong World Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher McCurry Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Prieto
Represented By: Gregory M. Gordon
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: C. Richard Rayburn, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Earl Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?