Gill v. Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company
Plaintiff: Timothy S Gill
Defendant: Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00681
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill.(jaw)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/6/2019. (brl)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days of service of this Order, file an Amended Complaint as set forth in this Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 01/17/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Miscellaneous Filing of Signature Page by Timothy S Gill. re: #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jaw)
December 28, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (jaw)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy S Gill. (jaw) Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jaw)
December 28, 2018 Added Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer; Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case due to conflict. (jaw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?