Schletter Inc. v. Gayk North America Inc.
Plaintiff: Schletter Inc.
Defendant: Gayk North America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00008
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Schletter Inc. re #4 Order withdrawing Bankruptcy Reference,,, Set Hearings,, (Ghidina, Douglas)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order ADOPTING and APPROVING the findings by the United States Bankruptcy Court's Order Requesting Withdrawal of Reference of Contested Matter for the limited purpose of conducting further proceedings solely but not limited to consideration of possible criminal contempt relief as to Gayk North America, Inc. and its President, Carl Otsuki. SHOW CAUSE HEARING set for 4/9/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/6/2019. (jaw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Schletter Inc. (Ghidina, Douglas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schletter Inc. (Ghidina, Douglas)
January 8, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order of US Bankruptcy Judge recommending Order Requesting Withdrawal of Reference of Contested Matter. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-40169. (bkbfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schletter Inc. v. Gayk North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schletter Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Ronald Ghidina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayk North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?