Merchants Bonding Company v. Strickland et al

Plaintiff: Merchants Bonding Company
Defendant: Randy C. Strickland, Lavonne Strickland and Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00052
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: two (2) to three (3) days. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Motions due by 10/14/2019. Mediation deadline set for 6/10/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/15/2019. (brl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Grimes, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc. (Grimes, J.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lavonne Strickland, Randy C. Strickland, Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc..(Grimes, J.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Douglas Grimes on behalf of Lavonne Strickland, Randy C. Strickland, Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc. (Grimes, J.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Specific Performance of Collateral Security Provision in Indemnity Agreement by Merchants Bonding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Arkansas Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Hansen, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Merchants Bonding Company. Randy C. Strickland served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proof-of-Delivery)(Stacy, Megan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Merchants Bonding Company. Lavonne Strickland served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proof-of-Delivery)(Stacy, Megan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Merchants Bonding Company. Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: United States Postal Service Tracking Information)(Stacy, Megan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan McGee Stacy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stacy, Megan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Specific Performance of Collateral Security Provision in Indemnity Agreement by Lavonne Strickland, Randy C. Strickland, Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc.. (Lilly, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lavonne Strickland, Randy C. Strickland, Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(brj)
February 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Michael Fisk re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Specific Performance of Collateral Security Provision in Indemnity Agreement filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: July 19, 2016 Notice and Tender)(Hansen, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Specific Performance of Collateral Security Provision in Indemnity Agreement by Merchants Bonding Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: The Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: The GAI, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: December 20, 2017 Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D: December 14, 2018 Demand Letter)(Hansen, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Specific Performance of Collateral Security Provision in Indemnity Agreement by Merchants Bonding Company. Responses due by 2/15/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction Order)(Hansen, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merchants Bonding Company (Hansen, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3927698), filed by Merchants Bonding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: The Bonds, #3 Exhibit C: Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit D: December 20, 2017 Demand Letter)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (brj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchants Bonding Company v. Strickland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy C. Strickland
Represented By: Matthew K. Lilly
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavonne Strickland
Represented By: Matthew K. Lilly
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland Waterproofing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew K. Lilly
Represented By: J. Douglas Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merchants Bonding Company
Represented By: Daniel R. Hansen
Represented By: Megan McGee Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?