Federal Trade Commission v. Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Ankh Ali, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, David Carr, Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, Aziza Ali, Regional Asset Maintenance LLC, TACS III, LLC, Omar Hussain, Jeremy Scinta, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC, LLI Business Innovations, LLC, Cedar Rose Holdings & Development, Inc., 10D Holdings, Inc. and Kenneth Moody
Case Number: 3:2019cv00055
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Complaint. 10D Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019; David Carr answer due 4/29/2019; Midwestern Alliance, LLC answer due 4/29/2019; TACS I, LLC answer due 4/29/2019; TACS II, LLC answer due 4/29/2019; TACS III, LLC answer due 4/29/2019; Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/1/19. (tob)
March 29, 2019 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint by 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dennis C. Vacco, #2 Proposed Order)(Richey, Alice)
March 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary K. Mandeville (Mandeville, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION Receiver's Report of Appraisal of Personal Property and Motion for Authority to Abandon the Same by A. Cotten Wright. Responses due by 3/29/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Wright, A.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. 10D Holdings, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. TACS III, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. TACS II, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. TACS I, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Midwestern Alliance, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. David Carr served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. LLI Business Innovations, LLC served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Jeremy Scinta served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Regional Asset Maintenance LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 39 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Jeremy Scinta and LLI Business Innovations, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/5/2019. (jaw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 38 STIPULATION to Enter Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Jeremy Scinta and LLI Business Innovations, LLC by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Quinn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 37 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Regional Asset Maintenance, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/28/2019. (jaw)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2019 by chambers. (jaw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Regional Asset Maintenance, LLC by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Quinn)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Allowing #34 Receiver's Application to Employ Accountant. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/27/2019. (jaw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 34 Receiver's Application to Employ Accountant by A. Cotten Wright. (Wright, A.) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (jaw).
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants David Carr, 10D Holdings, Inc., Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, and TACS III, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/25/2019. (jaw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION to Enter Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants David Carr, 10D Holdings, Inc., Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, and TACS III, LLC by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ashe, Gregory) Modified on 3/4/2019 to remove all capitalized text (jaw).
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Cedar Rose Holdings & Development, Inc. waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission. Omar Hussain waiver sent on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Kenneth Moody served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Aziza Ali served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Federal Trade Commission. Ankh Ali served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Martin, Quinn)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order based upon the hearing held on February 15, 2019 an agreement was reached to extend the Temporary Restraining Order until March 4, at 10:30 a.m. Should the parties fail to reach an agreement as to the pending Preliminary Injunction Motion by then, the Court will hold an Evidentiary Hearing at that time. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/15/2019. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 Miscellaneous Filing by A. Cotten Wright. re: #5 Temporary Restraining Order, Receiver's Preliminary Report (Wright, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Aziza Ali, Ankh Ali, Kenneth Moody, and Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/15/2019. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Omar Hussain and Cedar Rose Holdings and Development, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/15/2019. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Ex Parte Motion for Authority to Employ Grier & Crisp, PA as Attorneys for Receiver, Nunc Pro Tunc to February 4, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/15/2019. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Miscellaneous Filing by A. Cotten Wright. Ex Parte Motion for Authority to Employ Grier & Crisp, PA as Attorneys for Receiver, Nunc Pro Tunc to February 4, 2019 (Wright, A.)
February 15, 2019 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiffs Attorney: Quinn Roman Martin;Gregory Ashe;. Defendants Attorney: Dennis C. Vacco; Eric M. Soehnlein; Mary K. Mandeville; Telephonically - Richard Newman; J. Ginter. Receiver: Cotten Wright. Court Reporter: Laura Andersen. (jaw)
February 15, 2019 Removed duplicate entry
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Aziza Ali, Ankh Ali, Kenneth Moody, and Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Quinn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Omar Hussain and Cedar Rose Holdings and Development, Inc. by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Quinn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23-Second Suplplemental Declaration of Michael Goldstein, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, Quinn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Federal Trade Commission to file its Reply brief in response to Defendant's #14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Replies due by noon on 2/14/2019 to allow Court sufficient time to prepare for the hearing previously scheduled. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/13/2019. (brl)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary K. Mandeville on behalf of 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC (Mandeville, Mary)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Order to Show Cause by 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 2/20/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Vacco, Dennis)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Dennis C Vacco for 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, and Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/12/2019. (jaw)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric M Soehnlein for 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, and Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/12/2019. (jaw)
February 12, 2019 Notice to Eric M Soehnlein: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/19/2019. (jaw)
February 12, 2019 Notice to Dennis C Vacco: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/19/2019. (jaw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Bond of Receiver Issued by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $ 1,000.00 posted by A. Cotten Wright. (jaw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis Vacco Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3937063. by 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. (Richey, Alice)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Soehnlein Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3937056. by 10D Holdings, Inc., David Carr, Midwestern Alliance, LLC, TACS I, LLC, TACS II, LLC, TACS III, LLC, Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC. (Richey, Alice)
February 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. (eef)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (ams)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2019. (ams)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(ams)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER with an Asset Freeze, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2019. (ams)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with an Asset Freeze, Appointment of Receiver and Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Rule 65 Certification and Declaration, #3 Exhibits in Support of Motion, Table of Exhibits, #4 Exhibits 1-20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 FTC Recommendation for a Receiver, #8 Proposed Order)(ams) Modified on 2/5/2019 (rth).
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(ams)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Temporarily Seal Case. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2019. (ams)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Temporarily Seal Case by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankh Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwestern Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carr
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Asset Financial Services Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACS I, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACS II, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziza Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Asset Maintenance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACS III, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Scinta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans America Consumer Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLI Business Innovations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Rose Holdings & Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10D Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Eric M. Soehnlein
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Represented By: Mary K. Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Quinn Roman Martin
Represented By: Gregory Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?