BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. JC Propst Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Joshua Propst and JC Propst Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00059
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/1/2019. (eef)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JC Propst Trucking, LLC, Joshua Propst. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (brl)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION MOTION for Return of Property by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Fulton, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default of All Defendants by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulton, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION MOTION for Return of Property by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Fulton, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION MOTION for Return of Property by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Fulton, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 ***Withdrawn*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Return of Property by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulton, Joseph) Modified on 2/19/2019 (brl). Modified on 4/1/2019 (eef).
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Fulton, Joseph)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. All Defendants served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 . (Fulton, Joseph) Modified to add service & answer date on 2/19/2019 (brl).
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to JC Propst Trucking, LLC, Joshua Propst. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jaw)
February 5, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3930448), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fulton, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. JC Propst Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Propst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Propst Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Walker Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?