Basta v. Novant Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neil Basta
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00064
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew Rozynski for Neil Basta. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/18/19. (tob)
March 18, 2019 Notice to Andrew Rozynski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/25/2019. (tob)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Novant Health, Inc. answer due 4/12/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/14/19. (tob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Kelly on behalf of Novant Health, Inc. (Kelly, Patrick)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Novant Health, Inc.. (Kirk, Kimberly). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Health, Inc. (Kirk, Kimberly)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Health, Inc. (Kirk, Kimberly)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Rozynski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3965663. by Neil Basta. (Gohil, Sanjay). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Neil Basta. All Defendants. (Gohil, Sanjay)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Neil Basta. All Defendants. (Gohil, Sanjay)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Novant Health, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (clc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Novant Health, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (brj).
February 8, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3934286), filed by Neil Basta.(Gohil, Sanjay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basta v. Novant Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Basta
Represented By: Sanjay R. Gohil
Represented By: Andrew Rozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick E. Kelly
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?