Sanders v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Yvonda Sanders
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00069
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yvonda Sanders (White, Wesley)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sean G. Wieber for Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/19. (tob)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sean G. Wieber Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3962561. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Groves, Amanda). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. (Groves, Amanda)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Groves, Amanda). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2019 Notice to Sean G. Wieber: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/15/2019. (tob)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bank of America, N.A.'s Answer due 4/15/2019. SO ORDERED. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 03/08/2019. (DLG)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (jaw)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3937140), filed by Yvonda Sanders.(White, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Sean G. Wieber
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonda Sanders
Represented By: Wesley Steven White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?