Green v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Green
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Brock & Scott, PLLC and K Saanval Amin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: Max O Cogburn
1 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Brian Green. Responses due by 4/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Summons)(mga)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se RESPONSE re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Brian Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is allowed 30 days from the entry of this Order to pay the filing fee. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/20/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
February 19, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Green. (jaw)
February 14, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (jaw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against K Saanval Amin, Brock & Scott, PLLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Brian Green. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jaw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Saanval Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?