Davis v. MDC of Smithfield, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bradley P Davis
Defendant: MDC of Smithfield, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00076
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/8/19. (clc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley P Davis. MDC of Smithfield, Inc. waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Harman, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley P Davis. (Harman, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Luther D. Starling, Jr. - Registered Agent for MDC of Smithfield, Inc. - 405 East Market St, Smithfield, NC 27577 on 02/14/2019 by Bradley P Davis. (Harman, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MDC of Smithfield, Inc. with Jury Demand, filed by Bradley P Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue)(Harman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. MDC of Smithfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDC of Smithfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley P Davis
Represented By: Michael Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?