Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Defendant: Evansville Western Railway, Inc. and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00079
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant, CSX Transportation, Inc.'s, Motion to Dismiss Claims For Relief Two Through Six by Evansville Western Railway, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint, #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Goode, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Thomas Garrett)(Goode, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Goode, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Klein Wubker on behalf of All Defendants (Wubker, Kathleen)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Evansville Western Railway, Inc. shall have up to and including April 11, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/19. (mga)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joshua Steif on behalf of All Defendants (Steif, Andrew)
March 22, 2019 Notice to Kathleen Klein Wubker: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/29/2019. (mga)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kathleen Klein Wubker is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. and Evansville Western Railway, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/19. (mga)
March 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Goode, Mary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Little Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Kitchin, Henry)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathleen K. Wubker Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3974757. by CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Goode on behalf of Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Goode, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Notice to Andrew J. Steif: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/22/2019. (mga)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrew J. Steif is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/15/19. (mga)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew J. Steif Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3968599. by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Goode, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Little Kitchin, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Kitchin, Henry)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. shall have up to and including April 11, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/6/19. (mga)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Goode on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Goode, Mary)
February 28, 2019 Notice to Joanna Maxwell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/7/2019. (eef)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joanna Maxwell for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef)
February 28, 2019 Notice to Robert S. Crowder: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/7/2019. (eef)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert S. Crowder for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (brl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joanna Maxwell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941279. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert S. Crowder Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941273. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Chamberlin on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Chamberlin, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3941208), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waybills)(Lee, Scottie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evansville Western Railway, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Little Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Klein Wubker
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Steif
Represented By: Mary Ellen Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Little Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Klein Wubker
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Steif
Represented By: Mary Ellen Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Andrew S. Chamberlin
Represented By: Scottie Forbes Lee
Represented By: Joanna Maxwell
Represented By: Robert S. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?