El v. Preston et al

Plaintiff: My'Ka El
Defendant: M Wilde, R Preston, Jr, Charlotte Mecklenburg Police Department, R. Preston, Jr and M. Wilde
Case Number: 3:2019cv00090
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by My'Ka El. (brj). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to R. Preston, Jr, M. Wilde. (Attachments: #1 USM 285-Wilde, #2 USM 285-Preston)(ams)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/4/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
March 4, 2019 Motion referred to David S. Cayer.: #5 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis (brj)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by My'Ka El. (brj). Modified to remove referral on 3/4/2019 (ams).
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by My'Ka El. Responses due by 3/18/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (brj). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Motion referred to David S. Cayer.: #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis (brj)
February 22, 2019 Case Referral to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. (brj)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by My'Ka El. (brj) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Modified to add referral text on 2/25/2019 (brl).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Charlotte Mecklenburg Police Department, R Preston, Jr, M Wilde, filed by My'Ka El.(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El v. Preston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Preston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Mecklenburg Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Preston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My'Ka El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?