Andrews v. Frito-Lay, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kendall Andrews
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00094
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kristin S. Gray Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4010154. by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Gilley, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses by Frito-Lay, Inc..(Gilley, Matthew)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendall Andrews. Frito-Lay, Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Angel, Kirk)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CT Corporation System on 2/26/2019 by Kendall Andrews. (Angel, Kirk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frito-Lay, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3952256), filed by Kendall Andrews.(Angel, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Frito-Lay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Andrews
Represented By: Kirk J. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?