Washington v. The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority
Plaintiff: Pamela Washington
Defendant: The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: (5-7) days. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 1/15/2020. Mediator Designation deadline set for 6/15/2019. Mediation deadline set for 12/16/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/18/19. (mga)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Pamela Washington. (Spyker, Jennifer)
April 17, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. (eef)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Spyker, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Spyker, Jennifer)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority. Replies due by 4/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parsons, Kevin)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/16/2019. (jaw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal, Counterclaim by Pamela Washington.(Maloney, Margaret (Meg))
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Pamela Washington. (Maloney, Margaret (Meg)) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (rth).
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Pamela Washington. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Maloney, Margaret (Meg)) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (rth).
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority (Hinson, Philip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against Pamela Washington by The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority.(Hinson, Philip)
February 27, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (eef)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County, North Carolina Superior Court, case number 19-cvs-558. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3952909), filed by The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority d/b/a Atrium Health f/k/a Carolinas HealthCare System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parsons, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority
Represented By: Kevin V. Parsons
Represented By: Philip Andrew Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Washington
Represented By: Margaret (Meg) Behringer Maloney
Represented By: Jennifer Diane Spyker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?