Gold Value International Textile, Inc. v. The Cato Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Gold Value International Textile, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 and The Cato Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00101
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. The Cato Corporation served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Hudson, Seth)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Scott AlanBurroughs is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Gold Value International Textile,Inc. d/b/a "Fiesta Fabric". Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/19. (mga)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott Alan Burroughs Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3964095. by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Hudson, Seth). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Lee Hudson on behalf of Gold Value International Textile, Inc. (Hudson, Seth)
March 5, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
March 1, 2019 Notice to Scott Alan Burroughs: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 3/8/2019. (rth)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-10579. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of North Carolina (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON REQUEST TO TRANSFER VENUE granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pretrial deadlines shall be stayed pending the transfer of these claims. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/22/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case pursuant to U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Document filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/5/2019) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Scott Alan Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/17/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Cato Corporation. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gold Value International Textile, Inc., The Cato Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Scott Alan Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15906023. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cato Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Scott Alan Burroughs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15906023. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, The Cato Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15906010)Document filed by Gold Value International Textile, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Value International Textile, Inc. v. The Cato Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cato Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Value International Textile, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Represented By: Seth Lee Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?