Thomas v. Centralina Council of Government et al

Plaintiff: Sharon T. Thomas
Defendant: Linda Miller and Centralina Council of Government
Case Number: 3:2019cv00114
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Sharon T. Thomas (brj)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant(s) motion to dismiss. Response due April 25, 2019. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/26/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(STB)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time by Sharon T. Thomas. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (brj)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss by Centralina Council of Government, Linda Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perrin, Sean)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Centralina Council of Government, Linda Miller. Responses due by 3/27/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Perrin, Sean)
March 6, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-1689. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3959978), filed by Linda Miller, Centralina Council of Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Perrin, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Centralina Council of Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Miller
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centralina Council of Government
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?