Software Pricing Partners, LLC v. Geisman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00195
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Seal attorney billing information (Exhibit D) ( Document No. 92-6) to "Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Petition for Attorney's Fees and Expenses" under SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/14/22. (mga)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Software Pricing Partners, LLC against James H. Geisman. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/31/2022. (brl)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Seal. Exhibit 1 (Document No. 85-2) to "Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment" (Document No. 85-1) shall remain under SEAL until otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/9/22. (mga)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Seal Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum In Support of its Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/21. (mga)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 64 Defendant's Consent Motion to Seal Document No. 66 . Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/4/21. (mga)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff shall file Exhibit A to "Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Proposed Expert Report" (Document No. 59) under SEAL and Exhibit A shall remain under SEAL unless otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/21/2021. (brl)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/28/2020. (mek)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/6/2019. (brl)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Consolidate Motions to Dismiss and for a Joint Briefing Schedule. The Plaintiff shall have up to and including June 28, 2019 to file a response to the pending motions to dismiss, and Defendant shall have up to and including July 5, 2019 to file a reply brief in support of his motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/19. (mga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Software Pricing Partners, LLC v. Geisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?