Goodson et al v. Popov et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Goodson and Deitrich Goodson
Defendant: Leonid Popov and Leo's Express Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00223
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leo's Express Logistics, LLC (Spengler, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting with modification #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Leo's Express Logistics, LLC and Leonid Popov shall have up to and including July 22, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/26/19. (mga)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Leo's Express Logistics, LLC, Leonid Popov. (Spengler, Eric). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Straub Spengler on behalf of Leo's Express Logistics, LLC, Leonid Popov (Spengler, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Leo's Express Logistics, LLC answer due 7/2/2019. (ams)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Deitrich Goodson, Jacqueline Goodson. Leonid Popov served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Proof of Service)(Chestnut, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Deitrich Goodson, Jacqueline Goodson. Leo's Express Logistics, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Proof of Service)(Chestnut, Jason) Modified to correct date served and date answer due on 6/18/2019 (ams).
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Leo's Express Logistics, LLC, Leonid Popov. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Leo's Express Logistics, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Leonid Popov. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4024843), filed by Deitrich Goodson, Jacqueline Goodson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compensation Agreement)(Chestnut, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
May 10, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson et al v. Popov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Goodson
Represented By: Jason S. Chestnut
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deitrich Goodson
Represented By: Jason S. Chestnut
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonid Popov
Represented By: Eric Straub Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo's Express Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Eric Straub Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?