Compass Bank v. Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Defendant: Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc. and James Nyborg
Case Number: 3:2019cv00241
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James Nyborg, Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (brl)
July 17, 2019 Notice to Shane G. Ramsey: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/24/2019. (mga)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Shane G. Ramsey is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Compass Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/17/19. (mga)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shane G. Ramsey Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4099159. by Compass Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ortega, Ramona). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Compass Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ortega, Ramona)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Compass Bank. Defendants Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc. and James Nyborg served on 6/5/2018, answer due date 6/26/2019. (Ortega, Ramona) Modified to add service and answer date on 7/10/2019 (brl).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compass Bank (Ortega, Ramona)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to James Nyborg, Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj)
May 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4034965), filed by Compass Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ortega, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compass Bank v. Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyborg Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nyborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compass Bank
Represented By: Ramona F. Ortega
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?