United States of America v. Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency seized on February 7, 2019 and Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00255
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service (direct notice) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 07/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property (brl)
June 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency seized on February 7, 2019, filed by United States of America.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency seized on February 7, 2019
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $62,148 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?