Delgado v. Allstate Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Efren Delgado
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00270
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Notice to Mark L. Hanover: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/8/2019. (brj)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark L. Hanover for Allstate Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/01/2019. (brj)
August 1, 2019 Notice to Steven M. Levy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/8/2019. (brj)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Steven M. Levy for Allstate Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/01/2019. (brj)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Hanover Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4114853. by Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Todd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Levy Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4114844. by Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Todd)
July 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company answer due 8/19/2019. (brl)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. It is ordered that defendants' shall have up to and including August 19, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/16/2019. (STB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Todd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Todd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Allstate Indemnity Company, #2 Summons - Allstate Insurance Company)(brl)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Corporation, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4055078), filed by Efren Delgado.(Schwaba, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Allstate Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Todd A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Corporation
Represented By: Todd A. Jones
Represented By: Steven M. Levy
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Delgado
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Schwaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?