Philips North America, LLC v. Dorow et al
Plaintiff: Philips North America, LLC
Defendant: Dale E. Dorow and William M. Griswold
Case Number: 3:2019cv00272
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss (document #14). Plaintiff's response due August 19, 2019. Defendant's reply due September 3, 2019. So Ordered.. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/06/2019. (DLG)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule by Philips North America, LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Dale E. Dorow, William M. Griswold. (Raynal, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Dale E. Dorow, William M. Griswold. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Raynal, Charles)
July 17, 2019 SECOND Notice to Gerard Donovan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/24/2019. (tmg)
July 9, 2019 Notice to Gerard M. Donovan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/16/2019. (tob)
July 9, 2019 Notice to Gregory V. Vose: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/16/2019. (tob)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Robert Brennan for Philips North America, LLC; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gerard M. Donovan for Philips North America, LLC; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kirsten R. Rydstrom for Philips North America, LLC; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregory D. Vose for Philips North America, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/9/19. (tob)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory Vose Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4088805. by Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kirsten Rydstrom Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4088793. by Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gerard Donovan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4088751. by Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher R. Brennan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4088729. by Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: In light of the reassignment of this case to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, the Initial Scheduling Order of Chief Judge Whitney is no longer in effect. The Clerk will direct the parties to file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference and the Court will issue a Scheduling Order in due course. (maf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Dale E. Dorow answer due 7/25/2019; William M. Griswold answer due 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/1/19. (tob)
July 1, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Dale E. Dorow, William M. Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Raynal, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Vincent Carey on behalf of All Defendants (Carey, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips North America, LLC. Dale E. Dorow served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; William M. Griswold served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dorow Proof of Delivery, #2 Exhibit B - Griswold Proof of Delivery)(MacHarg, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj)
June 12, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips North America, LLC (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale E. Dorow, William M. Griswold with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4057133), filed by Philips North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Griswold Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Dorow Agreements, #3 Exhibit C - Griswold Affirmation, #4 Exhibit D - Dorow Affirmation)(MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (brj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America, LLC v. Dorow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale E. Dorow
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Carey
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Griswold
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Carey
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gregoy D. Vose
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?