Knox v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Doris Knox
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00296
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 3/13/2020. Mediation deadline set for 2/28/2020. Jury Trial set first day of the September Trial Term in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/12/19. (tob)
August 8, 2019 Added Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer; Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to case. (tob)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Page, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Page, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/5/2019. (brj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Page, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 SECOND Notice to Ada Vicuna: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court. Deadline by 7/19/2019. (tmg)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. answer due 7/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/3/19. (mga)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Page, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Anne Mitchell on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Mitchell, Caitlin)
June 26, 2019 Notice to Ada G. Vicuna: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court and Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/3/2019. (brj)
June 26, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Page, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Page on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Page, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Complaint with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19 CvS 9908. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4075828), filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint)(Page, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Page
Represented By: Caitlin Anne Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Knox
Represented By: A G. Vicuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?