Farrow v. IQ Data International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shaunda Farrow
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global and IQ Data International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00299
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shaunda Farrow (Allen, Ruth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Shaunda Farrow (Allen, Ruth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaunda Farrow. IQ Data International, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Allen, Ruth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shaunda Farrow (Allen, Ruth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global, with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4077636), filed by Shaunda Farrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrow v. IQ Data International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaunda Farrow
Represented By: Ruth M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?