Green v. Peresich et al
Plaintiff: Brian Green
Defendant: Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C. and Robert L. Peresich
Case Number: 3:2019cv00305
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint by Brian Green. (mek)
August 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: IFP Application due by 9/6/2019. (brl)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Application, using AO Form 239, within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/6/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
July 2, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally at case filing. (mek)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Green. (mek)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C., Robert L. Peresich, filed by Brian Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(mek)
July 1, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (mek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Peresich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glasser and Glasser, P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?