Puckett v. City of Charlotte
Plaintiff: Marty Puckett
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Case Number: 3:2019cv00310
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Spyker, Jennifer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant City of Charlotte's ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Charlotte.(Lucchesi, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by City of Charlotte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Lucchesi, Kathleen)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. City of Charlotte answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/11/19. (tob)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Charlotte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lucchesi, Kathleen). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 8, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Lincoln on behalf of City of Charlotte (Lincoln, Sara)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Phoebe Norton Coddington on behalf of City of Charlotte (Coddington, Phoebe)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-4139. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4084938), filed by City of Charlotte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex #1 - Puckett Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex #2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Lucchesi, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puckett v. City of Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Kathleen K. Lucchesi
Represented By: Phoebe Norton Coddington
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Puckett
Represented By: Margaret (Meg) Behringer Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?