Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Skill Sharp Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Timothy Wilson Music, Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Danny Simpson Music, Choice Is Tragic Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, Estes Park Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Only Hit Music, a division of Ken Shepherd Companies, Inc. and Only Hit Music
Defendant: Skill Sharp Technologies, LLC, The Trap, Constance McGrath and Theodore McGrath
Case Number: 3:2019cv00314
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boy Meets Girl Music, Estes Park Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Only Hit Music, Danny Simpson Music, Choice Is Tragic Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Timothy Wilson Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc.. Constance McGrath waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kapp, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boy Meets Girl Music, Estes Park Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Only Hit Music, Danny Simpson Music, Choice Is Tragic Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Timothy Wilson Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc.. Theodore McGrath waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kapp, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boy Meets Girl Music, Estes Park Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Only Hit Music, Danny Simpson Music, Choice Is Tragic Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Timothy Wilson Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc.. Skill Sharp Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kapp, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Crisco, Ronnie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Crisco, Ronnie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT on the filing or determination of a copyright action. (brj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Danny Simpson Music (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Timothy Wilson Music (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony ATV/Melody (Kapp, Michael) Modified filer's name on 7/9/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Is Tragic Music (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Estes Park Music (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Only Hit Music, a division of Ken Shepherd Companies, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Songs of Universal, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boy Meets Girl Music (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rondor Music International, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Keith Kapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kapp, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4087457 ), filed by Boy Meets Girl Music, Estes Park Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Only Hit Music, a division of Ken Shepherd Companies, Inc., Danny Simpson Music, Choice Is Tragic Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony ATV/Melody, Broadcast Music, Inc., Timothy Wilson Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Cover Sheet)(Kapp, Michael) Modified on 7/9/2019 to add additional filer Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony ATV/Melody. NEF Regenerated. (ejb) Modified on 7/9/2019 to add text of filing fee paid. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Skill Sharp Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skill Sharp Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trap
Represented By: Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance McGrath
Represented By: Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore McGrath
Represented By: Ronnie Dean Crisco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wilson Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bro 'N' Sis, Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Simpson Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Is Tragic Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Meets Girl Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estes Park Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Only Hit Music, a division of Ken Shepherd Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Only Hit Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?