Russell et al v. Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Doretha Johnson and Serita Russell
Defendant: Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC and Wellington Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00338
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and Notice of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court :, Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .( Responses due by 10/18/2019, Replies due by 10/25/2019 ) Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/13/19. (clc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court orders limited jurisdictional discovery re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Limited discovery served by 9/18/2019 and all responses shall be due no more than (21) days following service of the same. Supplemental briefing by both parties due 10/18/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/11/2019. (tmg)
September 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Dove on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dove, Sharon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Robert Wolf by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC. Replies due by 9/13/2019 (O'Brien, D.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC. Replies due by 9/13/2019 (O'Brien, D.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan [FRCP 26(f)] (Wright, Julian)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 9/6/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/26/2019. (DLG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Van Zant, Jennifer). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Maria Botella on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Botella, Natalia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Doretha Johnson, Serita Russell. (Wright, Julian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Doretha Johnson, Serita Russell. Responses due by 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (S. Russell Dec.), #2 Exhibit B (D. Johnson Dec.), #3 Exhibit C (H. Sharpe Aff.), #4 Exhibit D (J. Sunnycalb Aff.), #5 Exhibit E (FOF, Russell), #6 Exhibit F (FOF, Johnson), #7 Exhibit G (Annual Report, #8 Exhibit H (Deed), #9 Exhibit I (Lake Arbor lawsuit))(Wright, Julian)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/3/2019. (brj)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC.(Van Zant, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik M. Rosenwood on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenwood, Erik)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Broad Management Group, LLC answer due 8/13/2019; Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC answer due 8/13/2019; Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC answer due 8/13/2019; Wellington Advisors, LLC answer due 8/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/23/19. (tob)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Rose, Whitaker). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitaker Boykin Rose on behalf of All Defendants (Rose, Whitaker)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer K. Van Zant on behalf of All Defendants (Van Zant, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wellington Advisors, LLC (O'Brien, D.)
July 17, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broad Management Group, LLC (O'Brien, D.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC (O'Brien, D.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC (O'Brien, D.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Robert Wolf re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Broad Management Group, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Wellington Advisors, LLC (O'Brien, D.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19 cvs 11761. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4099592), filed by Wellington Advisors, LLC, Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, Broad Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits for Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A State Court General Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B State Court Summonses for All Defendants, #4 Exhibit C State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit D State Court Affidavits of Service for All Defendants, #6 Exhibit E State Court Motion and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC, #7 Exhibit F State Court Motion and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC, #8 Exhibit G State Court Motion and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Broad Management Group, LLC, #9 Exhibit H State Court Motion and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Wellington Advisors, LLC)(O'Brien, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Johnson
Represented By: Jack Holtzman
Represented By: Sharon S. Dove
Represented By: Julian Hugh Wright, Jr.
Represented By: Natalia Maria Botella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serita Russell
Represented By: Jack Holtzman
Represented By: Sharon S. Dove
Represented By: Julian Hugh Wright, Jr.
Represented By: Natalia Maria Botella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad Management Group, LLC
Represented By: D. J. O'Brien, III
Represented By: Erik M. Rosenwood
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: Whitaker Boykin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Arbor Dean TIC, LLC
Represented By: D. J. O'Brien, III
Represented By: Erik M. Rosenwood
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: Whitaker Boykin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Arbor 80M TIC, LLC
Represented By: D. J. O'Brien, III
Represented By: Erik M. Rosenwood
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: Whitaker Boykin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Advisors, LLC
Represented By: D. J. O'Brien, III
Represented By: Erik M. Rosenwood
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: Whitaker Boykin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?