Coston v. Trans Union LLC

Plaintiff: James Thomas Coston
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00347
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Opt In of PSAP Program by James Thomas Coston (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ctb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 5/16/2020. Motions due by 6/16/2020. Mediation deadline set for 6/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/3/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 PSAP Opt In/Out Form mailed to Pro Se Litigant. PSAP Response due by 9/9/2019 (brl)
August 23, 2019 Notice to Lauren M. Wood: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/30/2019. (mga)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lauren M. Wood is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Trans Union LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/23/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan by Trans Union LLC (deRosset, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren M. Wood Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4150366. by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(deRosset, Robert). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(deRosset, Robert) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/9/2019) (ctb).
August 2, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/23/2019. (mek)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal by Trans Union LLC.(deRosset, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC (deRosset, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Cowan deRosset, IV on behalf of Trans Union LLC (deRosset, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19 cvd 11673. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4102418), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(deRosset, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coston v. Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Robert Cowan deRosset, IV
Represented By: Lauren M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?