XPO Logistics, Inc. v. Northrop
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Jessica Northrop
Case Number: 3:2019cv00348
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 USCA Case Number 19-1961 for #22 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Kirsten Hancock. (reh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal, (brj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Jessica Northrop. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0419-4160616. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Gibbons, Philip)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: three (3) days. Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Motions due by 12/12/2019. Mediation deadline set for 11/29/2019. Bench Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/27/2019. (eef)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jessica Northrop. (Gibbons, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Replies due by 8/16/2019 (Jarrell, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Jarrell, Douglas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPO Logistics, Inc. (Jarrell, Douglas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Miscellaneous Filing by XPO Logistics, Inc.. re: #15 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, [Bond] (Jarrell, Douglas)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: CIAC Report due by 8/9/2019. (brl)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule 65(d), this injunction binds Northrop, as well as her officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall post a bond in the amount of $75,000. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall immediately confer and submit a Rule26(f) certification within seven (7) days of this Order proposing a schedule for trial as soon as practically possible. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/2/2019. (brl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Miscellaneous Filing by XPO Logistics, Inc.. re: #13 Declaration,, [Plaintiff's Objection to Supplemental Declaration of Jessica Northrop] (Jarrell, Douglas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Memorandum filed by Jessica Northrop (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - XPO Drayage Business, #2 Exhibit 2 - XPO Expedite Business, #3 Exhibit 3 - XPO Full Truckload Business, #4 Exhibit 4 - XPO Global Forwarding Business, #5 Exhibit 5 - XPO Intermodal Business, #6 Exhibit 6 - XPO Last Mile Business, #7 Exhibit 7 - XPO Less-Than-Truckload Business, #8 Exhibit 8 - XPO Managed Transportation Business, #9 Exhibit 9 - XPO Supply Chain Business, #10 Exhibit 10 XPO - Technology Business)(Gibbons, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF In Opposition to Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction by Jessica Northrop (Gibbons, Philip)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/19/2019. (brj)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Jessica Northrop.(Gibbons, Philip)
July 30, 2019 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Plaintiffs attorney: Douglas Jarrell & Gabriel Wright. Defendants attorney: Craig Leis, Jason Chestnut & Phillip Gibbons. Court reporter: Jill Turner. (clc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jessica Northrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Unpublished Court Opinion (XPO v. Anis))(Gibbons, Philip) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (rth).
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jessica Northrop. Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Philip) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (rth).
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Craig L. Leis re #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Jessica Northrop (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protocol for Examination, #2 Exhibit 2 - XPO Press Release)(Leis, Craig)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jessica Northrop. Replies due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jessica Northrop)(Leis, Craig)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Satyra L. Riggins re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / by XPO Logistics, Inc. (Jarrell, Douglas) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (brj).
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of James J. Byrne re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / by XPO Logistics, Inc. (Jarrell, Douglas) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (brj).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Jarrell, Douglas) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (brj).
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by XPO Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Jarrell, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a revised motion and brief in support of their motion citing applicable federal law no later than 4:30 p.m. Wednesday, July 24, 2019. Defendant shall have until 4:30 p.m. on Friday, July 26, 2019, to file any responsive pleading. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/22/19. (clc)
July 19, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 12904. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4102849), filed by Jessica Northrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(Leis, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XPO Logistics, Inc. v. Northrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas M. Jarrell
Represented By: Gabriel J. Wright
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Northrop
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Represented By: Jason S. Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?