Kesser v. Teupen Maschinebau GmbH et al
Plaintiff: David M. Kesser
Defendant: Martin Borutta, Teupen Maschinebau GmbH and Teupen North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00353
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Teupen North America, Inc.. (Pirtle, Shalanna)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Teupen North America, Inc.. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Pirtle, Shalanna)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Teupen North America, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Teupen North America, Inc. shall have up to and including September 16, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/15/19. (mga)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Teupen North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint)(Pirtle, Shalanna). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by David M. Kesser. Teupen North America, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Gessner, L.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Martin Borutta, Teupen Maschinebau GmbH, Teupen North America, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Teupen North America, Inc., #2 Summons - Martin Borutta)(mek)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4105061), filed by David M. Kesser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesser v. Teupen Maschinebau GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Borutta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teupen Maschinebau GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teupen North America, Inc.
Represented By: Shalanna L. Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Kesser
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?