TVL International, LLC v. Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: TVL International, LLC
Defendant: SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv00393
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Farnum on behalf of All Defendants (Farnum, David)
October 3, 2019 Notice to Sherry X. Wu: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/10/2019. (mga)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sherry X. Wu is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants SengLED USA, Inc. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/3/19. (mga)
October 3, 2019 Notice to David M. Farnum: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/10/2019. (mga)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David M. Farnum is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants SengLED USA, Inc. and Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/3/19. (mga) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (mga).
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sherry X. Wu Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4205329. by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Farnum Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4205325. by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD (Dedman, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SengLED USA, Inc. (Dedman, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. (Dedman, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. (Dedman, James)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Document No. #1 )on or before October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/30/19. (mga)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by TVL International, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wilder, Raboteau)
August 14, 2019 Case Referral to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (mek)
August 14, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. Any pending hearings are cancelled. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ttl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd., SengLED USA, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - SengLED USA, Inc.)(mek)
August 10, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
August 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TVL International, LLC (Rabon, Charles)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4131820), filed by TVL International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Final Award, #3 Exhibit Final Award)(Rabon, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TVL International, LLC v. Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SengLED USA, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Farnum
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Represented By: Sherry X. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD
Represented By: David M. Farnum
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Represented By: Sherry X. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TVL International, LLC
Represented By: Charles H. Rabon, Jr.
Represented By: Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr.
Represented By: Allison Leigh Vaughn
Represented By: Gregory Donald Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?