We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury v. United States Supreme Court et al
Plaintiff: We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury
Defendant: United States House, United States Senate, Federal Judiciary, United States Court of Appeals and United States Supreme Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv00428
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/2/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's September 3, 2019 Notice of Deficiency. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/2/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of FAKE LAW & FAKE COURTS by We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of ACTS OF HIGH TREASON by We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 9/24/2019. (brj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope)(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury v. United States Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Judiciary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We the People Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?