Hatch v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Johnathan Hatch
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. and PoliceReports.US,LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00449
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by J. David Stradley on behalf of Johnathan Hatch (Stradley, J.)
October 15, 2019 Entry Deleted Filed in Error. Modified on 10/21/2019 (tmg).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Julie Diane Hoffmeister is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Defendants LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc.,LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., and PoliceReports.US, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/15/19. (mga)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Cindy D. Hanson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., and PoliceReports.US, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/15/19. (mga)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ronald I. Raether, Jr. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., and PoliceReports.US, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/15/19. (mga)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Julie Diane Hoffmeister Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4219034. by LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., PoliceReports.US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Admissions, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deak, Dennis). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cindy Dawn Hanson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4219030. by LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., PoliceReports.US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Admissions, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deak, Dennis). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald Irvin Raether, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4219028. by LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., PoliceReports.US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Admissions, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deak, Dennis). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johnathan Hatch. LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019; LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019; LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019; PoliceReports.US, LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Brown, Drew)
September 19, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(clc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Johnathan Hatch. PoliceReports.US, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berry, Frederick)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Johnathan Hatch. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berry, Frederick)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Johnathan Hatch. LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berry, Frederick)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Johnathan Hatch. LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berry, Frederick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Brown on behalf of Johnathan Hatch (Brown, Drew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to LexisNexis Claims Solutions, Inc., LexisNexis Coplogic Solutions Inc., LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., PoliceReports.US, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - LEXISNEXIS Coplogic Solutions Inc, #2 Summons - PoliceReports.US, LLC, #3 Summons - LEXISNEXIS Risk Solutions, Inc.)(brj)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Berry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berry, Frederick)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Johnathan Hatch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloss, John)
September 13, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
September 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4176094), filed by Johnathan Hatch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloss, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatch v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PoliceReports.US,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Johnathan Hatch
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?