Truck Insurance Exchange v. Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. and Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00467
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order Staying Case by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Martinez, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Miller, Jr on behalf of Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Miller, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. (Fulton, Ross)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Fulton, Ross)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order Staying Case by Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Replies due by 10/30/2019 (Fulton, Ross)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Order Staying Case by Truck Insurance Exchange. Responses due by 10/23/2019 (Martinez, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STAYING CASE until the bankruptcy court rules on the plan of reorganization. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/01/2019. (ctb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Truck Insurance Exchange (Martinez, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Truck Insurance Exchange. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (bkCH)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Scott R. Hoyt: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Michael A. Rosenthal: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Robert B. Krakow: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Alan Moskowitz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Matthew G. Bouslog: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)
September 20, 2019 Notice to Dylan S. Cassidy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/27/2019. (mek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truck Insurance Exchange v. Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Robert Fulton
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Robert Fulton
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Alan Moskowitz
Represented By: Scott R. Hoyt
Represented By: Robert B. Krakow
Represented By: Michael L. Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Glenn Bouslog
Represented By: Michael A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Dylan S. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?